judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01375-CR
01-96-01375-CR
11/12/1996
Other Felony
Stratton, James W.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/20/2001Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/20/2001Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/11/2000Petition for discretionary review due
10/27/2000Motion for Rehearing Due
10/12/2000Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/12/2000Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/10/2000Submitted
10/10/2000Submission
10/10/2000Submitted
09/13/2000Oral argument has been waived
09/01/2000Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
08/04/2000Supplemental Clerk's Record Due
07/06/2000Order enteredOtherwise disposed
06/05/2000Brief Due
05/04/2000Order enteredOtherwise disposed
03/31/2000Notice to parties-non payment of rptr record
04/29/1999Response due to a motion or Court's Order.
04/14/1999Notice to parties-non payment of rptr record
03/10/1999Reporter's Record Past Due Notice sent
03/09/1999Reporter's Record Past Due Notice sent
01/06/1997Record due
01/06/1997Transcript filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/07/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
11/07/1996Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/20/2001Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
COUNTY CLERKCounty clerk
Stratton, James W.Criminal - AppellantJames W. Stratton
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
District Clerk, District District clerkCharles Bacarisse
REPORTER, COURTCourt reporterDeanne Bridwell
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 13
Harris
Honorable MARK DOUGLAS ATKINSON
9636263
200.00 Fine