judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-96-00429-CV
08-96-00429-CV
11/12/1996
Other Personal Injury
Andrews, Gilbert E.
Cuellar, Enrique R., Juan F. Hernandez & Randy Bullis
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/02/1999Mandate Issued
06/02/1999Mandate Issued
04/03/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
04/03/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
03/20/1997Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
02/07/1997Payment of fee due requested
12/23/1996Payment of fee due requested
12/23/1996Transcript Filed
11/12/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/02/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CUELLAR, ENRIQUE R.AppelleeHon. Donato David Ramos
ANDREWS, GILBERT E.AppellantHon. Stephen A. Hines
BULLIS, RANDYAppelleeRandy Bullis
HERNANDEZ, JUAN F.AppelleeHon. Paul David Gallego
Trial Court Information
327th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Philip R. Martinez
93-7378