judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-96-00909-CR
04-96-00909-CR
11/12/1996
Forgery
Juan A. Mercado
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/1997Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/29/1997Mandate Issued
04/29/1997Mandate Issued
02/28/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
02/28/1997Motion to Withdraw Counsel DisposedFiling is Moot
02/28/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
02/28/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
02/11/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/06/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/06/1997Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
01/14/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/14/1997No Description Available.
11/27/1996No Description Available.
11/27/1996No Description Available.
11/14/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/14/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/08/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/14/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
09/16/1996Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/29/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasSteven C. Hilbig
Juan A. MercadoCriminal - AppellantFrankie Geneva Boyd
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mary Dolores Roman
92-CR-7838-W
10 Years.