judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-96-00918-CV
04-96-00918-CV
11/12/1996
Other Personal Injury
Eagle Pass Housing Authority
Maricela Diaz Avila, Individually And As Next Friend of Ramon Avila, Jr., A Minor
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/07/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/02/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
07/02/1997No New Event but Update in Calendar
06/03/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
06/03/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
06/03/1997Motion Filed
04/14/1997Mandate Issued
04/14/1997Mandate Issued
04/09/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
04/09/1997Motion to Vacate DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
03/19/1997Motion to Vacate Filed
03/19/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/19/1997Order Entered
03/18/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/18/1997No Description Available.
02/26/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
01/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventAbated
01/21/1997Order EnteredAbated
01/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1997Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/07/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/07/1997Motion Filed
01/07/1997Motion to Abate Filed
01/03/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/27/1996Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996No Description Available.
12/10/1996Continuation of Information from previous eventFiling is Moot
12/10/1996Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
12/10/1996Motion DisposedFiling is Moot
12/10/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/10/1996Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/10/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/10/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/10/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/10/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/10/1996Order Entered
12/09/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/09/1996No Description Available.
12/09/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/09/1996No Description Available.
12/05/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/05/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/05/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/05/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/05/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/05/1996Information regarding cause received
12/03/1996Brief Filed
12/03/1996Requests Oral Argument
11/27/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/27/1996Response to Motion Filed
11/27/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/27/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/27/1996No Description Available.
11/25/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/25/1996Motion Filed
11/25/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/25/1996Motion Filed
11/25/1996Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
11/25/1996Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/1996Motion to Supplement Record Filed
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/21/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1996No Description Available.
10/21/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1996Exhibits Filed
10/15/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/15/1996Appeal Bond Filed
10/15/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
08/08/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
07/30/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
07/30/1996Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/14/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eagle Pass Housing AuthorityAppellantCharles H. Sierra
Ricardo J. Navarro
Maricela Diaz Avila, Ind.;etalAppelleeLawrence G. Morales
Noe Reyna
Raul M. Calderon
Trial Court Information
365th Judicial District Court
Maverick
Honorable Amado J. Abascal, III
96-06-13867-CV
n/a