judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARVER (ELBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30018
Short Caption:CARVER (ELBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C129275Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/21/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/25/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
02/25/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
05/27/1997Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed."
06/02/1997Other Other. Returned, unfiled , proper person Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.
06/13/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Appeal. (No action taken-see letter in correspondence file.)
06/17/1997RemittiturIssued Remittitur.
06/19/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Letter from proper person Appellant Elbert S. Carver re: timeliness of notice of appeal.
06/20/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Appeal to United States District Court. (No action taken.)
06/26/1997RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Entering Receipt for Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 20, 1997. REMITTITUR RECALLED 2/10/98.
02/10/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Granting Rehearing and Reinstating Appeal. We grant appellant's petition for rehearing, we recall the remittitur, and we reinstate this appeal as an appeal from an order of the district court denying appellant's post conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. We direct the clerk of this court to file the letter received on June 19, 1997. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record as well any previously prepared transcript of the district court proceedings. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court].
02/10/1998Other Other. Remittitur recalled.
02/10/1998Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter from appellant Elbert S. Carver re: timeliness of notice of appeal, received June 19, 1997.
02/20/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Motion.
02/20/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Supplement to Opening Brief-Exhibits 1 through 12.
02/23/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Motion/Request.
03/25/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Request to Modify Numeric Mistake Made in the Citation of Authorities of Appellant's Brief.
04/13/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Appeal (from denial of appellant's request for production of transcripts of proceedings).
05/06/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Motion to Consolidate Appeals (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to Appellant).
05/13/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Motion to Consolidate Appeals (Received the original only-nos. 30018 & 32156).
07/21/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2 (copies).
07/21/1998Other Other. Case submitted on the Record on Appeal this day.
07/21/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/02/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Petition for Mandate (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to Appellant).
12/02/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Petition for Writ of Mandate (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to Appellant).
05/17/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Letter with attachments (Received the original only).
09/03/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Motion and Motion for Transcripts at Petitioners Expense and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Request Petitioners Expense; Notice of Petition for Writ of Mandate. (Original and 1 copy.)
11/22/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Letter with attachments. (Received the original only).
08/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 20 & 22,1995; October 9, 16 and 20, 1995. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 00-15357
11/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn7[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that therelief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-19673
12/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19694
12/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2000. 00-19694