judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MYRA JEAN FORD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0021)
Case Number:S-11-0021Case Docketed On:01/25/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:MYRA JEAN FORD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MYRA JEAN FORD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMyra Jean FordDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Meri Vania Geringer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 122
Citation:259 P.3d 1178

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/25/2011Event - Deficient pleading returnedEventDeficient pleading returnedFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/14/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/06/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/09/2011Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
05/10/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Meri Geringer for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/23/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Meri Vania Geringer, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/12/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/12/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/19/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/15/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal