judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ACKLIN (PAUL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 29996
Short Caption:ACKLIN (PAUL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47730
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR891737Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/23/1997How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/19/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
02/19/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
02/21/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. To File Case Appeal Statement. Due date: 10 days.
02/24/1997Other Other. Received certified copy of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on February 19, 1997.
03/03/1997Other Other. Received certified copy of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on February 19, 1997.
03/07/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
03/14/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Judith Schonlau.
04/16/1997TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript dated December 17, 1997. Court Reporter: Susan C. Kiger.
04/18/1997MotionFiled Motion. Stipulation and Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal. Stricken-see Order filed 5/8/97.
04/30/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. "We hereby dismiss this appeal."
05/08/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Due to an administrative error, on April 30, 1997, we entered an order dismissing this appeal. We vacate and strike our April 30, 1997, order and reinstate briefing in this matter. Appellant shall have to and including June 19, 1997, to file and serve the opening brief. Thereafter briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Order Dismissing Appeal filed April 30, 1997 stricken.)
06/20/1997MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have to and including July 20, 1997, to file the opening brief.
07/22/1997MotionFiled Motion. To Extend Time to File Opening Brief.
07/24/1997Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting the motion filed July 22, 1997. The opening brief shall be served and filed on or before August 20, 1997.
08/21/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 8/20/97).
08/21/1997AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1 through 3. (Mailed on: 8/20/97).
09/25/1997MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent shall have to and including October 22, 1997, to file the answering brief.
10/22/1997BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 10/21/97).
11/21/1997MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have to and including December 22, 1997, to file Reply Brief.
12/23/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 12/22/97).
12/23/1997Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/01/1998MotionFiled Motion. To Withdraw as Counsel.
10/01/1998Other Other. Filed Substitution of Counsel. Karla K. Butko as counsel for appellant.
11/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Attorney Joseph R. Plater has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellant herein. We grant attorney Plater's motion and approve the substitution of counsel. The clerk shall modify the docket to indicate that attorney Butko is counsel of record for appellant herein.
11/17/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Amy Harvey, Washoe County Clerk regarding transmission of trial transcripts.
11/22/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 12. 00-20585
03/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-04005
04/02/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-04103
04/02/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/04/2001RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 12 this day. 01-04103
04/06/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 4, 2001. 01-04103
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on April 5, 2001. 01-04103