judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICARDO POSTELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1539
Short Caption:RICARDO POSTELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-21759-09Filed Date:12/07/2010

Opening Event Date:12/07/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/27/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/03/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRicardo Postell YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kristina L. AmentYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Barbara E. Kittay, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Barbara E. Kittay, Esquire
01/12/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (103 pgs/Hamilton) 10/19/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (133 pgs/Hamilton) 10/20/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (5 pgs/Hamilton) 10/21/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (9 pgs/Hamilton) 10/22/10 proc. w/cd
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
03/02/2011RECORD COPIES
03/02/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/23/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/23/2011APPENDIX
04/20/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 27, 2011. (JAC)
05/27/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/27/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/31/2011FiledAPLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo
06/08/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/22/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/27/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
07/05/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
07/11/2011FiledOrdered that the motion is hereby held in abeyance and referred to the merits panel upon assignment.
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/18/2011FiledOrder Granting aple's motion to supplement the record.
10/19/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (unofficial transcript)
11/03/2011FiledArgued before Chief Judge Washington, Judges Fisher, King
12/08/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and King, Senior Judge)
12/16/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/30/2011FiledMandate