judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONNA STEPHENS V. CAP CITY MANAGEMENT,INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1528
Short Caption:DONNA STEPHENS V. CAP CITY MANAGEMENT,INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Lead: 10-CV-1525 Consolidated: 10-CV-1526 , 10-CV-1528, 10-CV-1542 , 10-CV-1543 , 10-CV-1554
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB15539-10Filed Date:12/03/2010

Opening Event Date:12/03/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/31/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/09/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/20/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonna Stephens N
Robert C. Cooper YN
AppelleeCap City Management, Inc.N
Kevin I. KaneNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/03/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/17/2010 Upon consideration of the notice of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that transcript is needed for these appeals, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CV-1525, 10-CV-1526 and 10-CV-1528 are consolidated for all purposes. It is (MORE)
12/17/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellants shall within 20 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reportin Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being order, appellants must file a statement of issues to be presented with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' failure to this order, shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC) elp
12/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (All) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 9/17/10 and 11/19/10) (elp)
01/05/2011 Upon consideration of the notice of appeal in these matters, and the statements regarding transcripts, and it appearing that transcript is needed for these appeals, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CV-1542, 10-CV-1543 and 10-CV-1554 are consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CV-1525, 10-CV-1526 and 10-CV-1528 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record indexes and transcripts required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
01/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (1450-pgs/tape 9/17/10 proc.)
01/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (48-pgs/tape 11/19/10 proc.)w/cd
01/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/18/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/21/2011RECORD INDEX 10cv1526
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX 10cv1554
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX 10cv1543
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX 10cv1528
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX 10cv1542
02/28/2011APPELLANTS BRIEF (All Aplts)
02/28/2011APPENDIX (All Aplts)
03/31/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/31/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/09/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Fisher, Steadman
03/28/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge)
04/20/2012FiledMandate