judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARREN (KEITH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30473
Short Caption:WARREN (KEITH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35235
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C73295Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/26/1997How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/23/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/23/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant.)
06/05/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/25/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment.
07/03/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 7/2/97.)
07/14/1997Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Concerning the Appellant's Opening Brief. (Original and one copy.)
07/17/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to file a supplemental Opening Brief to the Appellant's Opening Brief. (Original and 3 copies - one copy returned.)
07/31/1997MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent shall have to and including September 2, 1997, to file the answering brief.
08/04/1997Other Other. Received Certified Copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in the district court July 29, 1997.
08/28/1997BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Express - No postmark.)
08/28/1997AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. (Mailed on: Express - No postmark.)
09/11/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We deny Appellant's Proper Person Motion for Leave to file a Proper Person Supplemental Opening Brief. fn1[We have received and considered appellant's submission]. Any requests for relief by Appellant should be submitted directly to his attorney, Frank J. Toti.
09/26/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 9/25/97.)
09/26/1997Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/30/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. "The right to die legally" (received the original only).
08/25/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. It is not within the discretion of this court to grant the relief Appellant requests. Accordingly, we deny Appellant's request. Fn1[We note that Appellant has not been granted leave to file briefs and papers herein. Nevertheless, we have received and considered Appellant's proper person motion.]
12/01/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. From the U.S. Supreme Court: The Petition for a writ of certiorari in the above entitled case was filed November 16, 1998, and placed on the docket November 16, 1998 as #98-6871.
01/25/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. From the Supreme Court of the United States. The Court entered an order denying the Petition for Writ of Certiorari (mailed on: 1/20/99).
09/23/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Notice and Motion to dismiss Frank J. Toti No. 005804 Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Received original and two copies - 1 copy returned to Appellant).
10/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On September 23, 1999, Appellant submitted a Proper Person Motion to dismiss his court appointed attorney. fn1[Appellant has not been granted leave to file papers in Proper Person. Nevertheless, we have received and considered Appellant's Proper Person Motion.] We deny Appellant's Motion.
10/11/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Petition for Rehearing NRAP 40(a) of Order by Nevada Supreme Court filed October 1, 1999, and Rec. October 4, 1999. (Original and 2 copies - one copy returned).
10/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On October 11, 1999, Appellant submitted a Proper Person "Petition for Rehearing NRAP 40(a) of . . . Order . . . Filed October 1, 1999." fn1[Appellant has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person. Nevertheless, we have received and considered Appellant's Proper Person Petition]. We deny the petition.
11/05/1999Other Other. Filed Order of Remand for Designation of Counsel. The court has concluded that Appellant should be represented by counsel in his first direct appeal as of right from the judgment of conviction entered on December 23, 1986. This court remands this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of appointing Kajioka & Christiansen as counsel for Appellant in his direct appeal within 20 days from the date of this order. Within 5 days from the appointment of counsel, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order or remand on Appellant's counsel. The clerk of the district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court a certified copy of the Notice of Appeal filed on January 13, 1987, and all documents listed in NRAP 3(e). Upon receipt of these documents, the clerk of this court shall docket the direct appeal as a separate proceeding under a new docket number. Counsel shall have 10 days from the date of appointment to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court and 20 days to file a docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. Briefing shall thereafter proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[At this time, this court does not take any dispositive action with regard to the instant post-conviction appeal. This matter remains pending in this court. Although Appellant's direct appeal was filed in 1987, this court has elected to apply the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure currently in effect.]
12/02/1999Other Other. Filed Certified Copy of Minutes of Appointment of counsel. Frank Toti is appointed as counsel. (1/25/00 - TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO 35235)
12/02/1999Other Other. Filed Certified Copy of Order Appointing Counsel. Frank J. Toti is hereby appointed as counsel of record to represent Keith A. Warren for the purpose of this appeal (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). (1/25/00 - TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET 35235)
01/21/2000MotionFiled Motion. (1/25/00 - TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 35235)
01/25/2000Other Other. Transferred three documents re: counsel to docket no. 35235 per this court's order of November 5, 1999. (Note: These documents were received for filing before No. 35235 was docketed.)
12/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Because Warren's petition is procedurally barred, we need not reach the merits of the claims raised in the petition. "We therefore affirm the judgment of the district court." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 00-21567
12/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On December 1, 2000, appellant submitted a proper person request for clarification of the status of the appeal. We deny appellant's proper person request as moot. 00-22124
01/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21785
01/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/22/2001MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 30473/35235. 01-01459
01/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On January 22, 2001, appellant filed a motion to consolidate the appeals in Docket No. 30473 and Docket No. 35235. We note that this court issued an order of affirmance in Docket No. 30473 on December 11, 2000, and issued the remittitur in that case on January 8, 2001. As this court's jurisdiction in Docket No. 30473 has ended, we deny appellant's motion to consolidate as moot (nos. 30473/35235). 01-01623
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2001. 00-21785