judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSHUA CARMILLO LASCANO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0009)
Case Number:S-11-0009Case Docketed On:01/11/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JOSHUA CARMILLO LASCANO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOSHUA CARMILLO LASCANO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoshua Carmillo LascanoDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Gregory A. Phillips

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 144
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/11/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/24/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2011Order - Grant - extension of time to file brief of AppellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/14/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/06/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/21/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/28/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Exhibits (filed in CR-6500 co-defendant's case).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/19/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/08/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/7/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal