judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO PRESGRAVES

Case Information: 33504
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO PRESGRAVESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9806274Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/04/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/23/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00484
02/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-00964
03/04/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Mailed on:3/3/99. 99-01543
03/04/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/06/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/9/99 & 11/10/99. Court Reporter: Karen S. Netley. 99-02557
05/11/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-03817
06/08/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 99-04767
06/08/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 11, 1999. 99-04767