judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE STATE OF WYOMING v. DOUGLAS JUAREZ

Case Heading (S-10-0260)
Case Number:S-10-0260Case Docketed On:12/14/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING v. DOUGLAS JUAREZ
Full Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING, Petitioner, v. DOUGLAS JUAREZ, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie
RespondentDouglas JuarezRobert T. Moxley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2011 WY 110
Citation:256 P.3d 517

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/14/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/14/2010Petition - Writ - review/certiorariPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
12/14/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/29/2010Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
12/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response to petition for review/certiorariEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
02/17/2011Brief - PetitionerBriefPetitionerFinal
02/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Petitioner and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/05/2011Brief - RespondentBriefRespondentFinal
04/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of respondent; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. Original was not signed. Requested pages 14-15 with original signature.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Received original signature pages 14-15.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/13/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/26/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/14/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/01/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/01/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal