judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. D. SMITH v. ANTON F. HOLBERG AND W. D. SMITH, TEXAS EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION

Case: B-1256
B-1256
12/17/1968
Application for Writ of Error
W. D. SMITH
ANTON F. HOLBERG AND W. D. SMITH, TEXAS EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/07/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/04/1969Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/17/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
12/17/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
12/17/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/12/1969Response to Motion filed
05/07/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/23/1969Opinion issued
03/04/1969Brief on the Merits
01/29/1969Document received (See Remarks)
12/17/1968Response to Petition
12/17/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/17/1968Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/17/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Anton F. Holberg and W. D. SmithRespondent
W. D. SmithPetitioner
TEXAS EMPLOYMENT COMMISSIONRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information