judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-04,438-02
WR-04,438-02
11/08/1976
11.07 HC
BAYSON, CARL LAVERNE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1977MISC DOCUMENT RECD
12/07/1976MISC DOCUMENT RECD
11/17/1976ACTION TAKENHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
11/08/1976WRIT RECEIVED
03/11/1975SUPP/CLERK RECORD
03/05/1975SUPP/CLERK RECORD
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/1976STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BAYSON, CARL LAVERNEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
W76-10033-H