judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RIVERSIDE HOTEL VS. 2ND JUD DIST CT

Case Information: 33503
Short Caption:RIVERSIDE HOTEL VS. 2ND JUD DIST CTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33878
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9701453Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson--check no. 034023.
12/22/1998Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Writ of Mandamus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus; Exhibits. 98-00483
01/04/1999MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion for Consideration of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 99-00010
01/04/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Service of Petition for Writ of Mandamus on Deputy City Attorney. 99-00011
01/11/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 99-00158
01/19/1999Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. Second Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 99-00374
01/19/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for first Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus 99-00376
01/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Second Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 99-00500
01/29/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: " . . . we deny the petition." SNP-WM/DA/NB. 99-00639
02/23/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-01194
02/23/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.