judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARY ANN BALLEW V. SKY BLUE TOURS, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1516
Short Caption:MARY ANN BALLEW V. SKY BLUE TOURS, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6870-09Filed Date:11/30/2010

Opening Event Date:11/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/08/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/12/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMary Ann Ballew N
Kim D. Brooks-Rodney YN
AppelleeSky Blue Tours Inc.N
Sanford A. FriedmanYY
Nancy K. Mintz NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/14/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
12/16/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 30, 2010, and the statement regarding transcript, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
02/03/2011RECORD INDEX
02/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/18/2011APPENDIX
04/08/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/08/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/25/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/12/2011FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Oberly, Steadman Kim D. Brooks-Rodney, Esq. for appellant Sanford A. Friedman, Esq. for appellee
10/20/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge)
11/10/2011FiledMandate