judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STATE OF TEXAS v. SPARTANS INDUSTRIES, INC., ET AL.

Case: B-1255
B-1255
12/17/1968
Direct Appeal
STATE OF TEXAS
SPARTANS INDUSTRIES, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/02/1970Notice of Appeal filed
02/02/1970Notice of Appeal filed
11/24/1969Brief in Support of Petition
11/24/1969Brief in Support of Petition
11/21/1969Brief in Support of Petition
11/21/1969Brief in Support of Petition
11/19/1969Motion for Rehearing
04/25/1969Brief on the Merits
04/07/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/19/1969Response to Brief filed
02/17/1969Brief on the Merits
01/08/1969Direct Appeal filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/19/1970Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
05/19/1970Letter Filed
04/22/1970Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
03/02/1970Notice of Appeal filed
02/02/1970Notice of Appeal filed
12/03/1969Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
11/24/1969Brief in Support of Petition
11/24/1969Brief in Support of Petition
11/21/1969Brief in Support of Petition
11/21/1969Brief in Support of Petition
11/19/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/05/1969Dissenting opinion issued.
11/05/1969Opinion issued
04/25/1969Brief on the Merits
04/07/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/07/1969Motion for leave to file brief
03/25/1969Motion for Extension of Time filedFiling granted
03/19/1969Response to Brief filed
02/17/1969Brief on the Merits
01/29/1969Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
01/08/1969Direct Appeal filed
12/17/1968Document received (See Remarks)
12/17/1968Letter Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gayle E. OlerAmicus Curiae
State of TexasAppellant
Spartans Industries, Inc., et al.Appellee
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information