judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6377
B-6377
11/10/1976
Application for Writ of Error
RHODES ERWIN MORRIS, ET AL.
DAVID RICE, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR AND TRUSTEE OF ESTATE OF EARL MORRIS, DECEASED, JOHN L. HILL, ATTORNEY OF TEXAS, TEXAS SCOTTISH RITE HOSPITAL FOR CRIPPLED CHILDREN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/02/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
11/29/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
11/24/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
11/10/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/28/1977Motion to dismissFiling granted
06/29/1977Letter Filed
04/14/1977Letter Filed
12/02/1976Response to Petition
11/29/1976Response to Petition
11/24/1976Response to Petition
11/10/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/10/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rhodes Erwin Morris, et al.Petitioner
John L. Hill, Attorney of TexasRespondent
David Rice, Independent Executor and Trustee of Estate of Earl Morris, deceasedRespondent
Texas Scottish Rite Hospital for Crippled ChildrenRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information