judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6390
B-6390
11/01/1976
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHWEST TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
NORTHLAND BUILDING CORPORATION, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PLANO, JEFFERY GRYNWALD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/22/1977Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
06/22/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/16/1977Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/16/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/08/1977Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/08/1977Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/04/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/04/1977Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/02/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
12/02/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
11/29/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
11/17/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/22/1977Brief in Support of Petition
06/22/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/16/1977Brief in Support of Petition
06/16/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/08/1977Opinion issued
06/08/1977Supplemental Brief filed
04/08/1977Supplemental Brief filed
04/04/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/04/1977Supplemental Brief filed
03/09/1977Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1977Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1977Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1977Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1977Document received (See Remarks)
12/02/1976Response to Petition
12/02/1976Response to Petition
11/29/1976Response to Petition
11/17/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/01/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jeffery GrynwaldRespondent
First National Bank of PlanoRespondent
Southwest Title Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Title Underwriters of TexasAmicus Curiae
Northland Building CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information