judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6365
B-6365
11/05/1976
Application for Writ of Error
NORTH STAR DODGE, INC.
FOREMOST COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/28/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/17/1976Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/01/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/22/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
11/05/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/28/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/17/1976Supplemental Brief filed
12/01/1976Reply to Response
11/22/1976Response to Petition
11/05/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/05/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
North Star Dodge, Inc.Petitioner
Foremost County Mutual Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information