judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER QUINCER V. LATASHA LEWIS

Case Information: 11-FM-0046
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER QUINCER V. LATASHA LEWISClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO4270-10Filed Date:01/11/2011

Opening Event Date:01/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/10/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChristopher Quincer NPro SeN
AppelleeLatasha Lewis N
Susan M. Atkins YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/26/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 11, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
01/31/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 12/17/10 (rt. needed)
02/07/2011STATEMENT OF ISSUE(S)
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (57 pgs/tape) 12/17/10 proc. w/cd
03/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/29/2011RECORD INDEX
04/01/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
04/19/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/19/2011APPENDIX
05/09/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Christopher Quincer 3309 Theodore R. Hagans Drive, NE Washington, DC 20018 703 296-1636
05/13/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/13/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/10/2012FiledSubmitted To Fisher,Oberly,King
03/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Oberly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge)
04/06/2012FiledMandate