judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRANDON A. PURCELLA and MILLICENT JULYNN JONES, TRUSTEES OF THE PURCELLA MARITAL TRUST v. CYNTHIA R. PURCELLA, INDIVIDUALLY and as TRUSTEE OF THE PURCELLA MARITAL TRUST

Case Heading (S-10-0266)
Case Number:S-10-0266Case Docketed On:12/22/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4)
Short Title:BRANDON A. PURCELLA and MILLICENT JULYNN JONES, TRUSTEES OF THE PURCELLA MARITAL TRUST v. CYNTHIA R. PURCELLA, INDIVIDUALLY and as TRUSTEE OF THE PURCELLA MARITAL TRUST
Full Title:BRANDON A. PURCELLA and MILLICENT JULYNN JONES, TRUSTEES OF THE PURCELLA MARITAL TRUST, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. CYNTHIA R. PURCELLA, INDIVIDUALLY and as TRUSTEE OF THE PURCELLA MARITAL TRUST, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrandon A. PurcellaTimothy S. Tarver
AppellantMillicent JuLynn JonesTimothy S. Tarver
AppelleeCynthia R. PurcellaH.W. Rasmussen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Trusts
Opinion Number:2011 WY 124
Citation:258 P.3d 730 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/22/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/22/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/25/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Appellants' Statement of Costs of Original Transcript and Appellants' Designation of Record on Appeal and copy on CDEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Cynthia Purcella and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/11/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant re copies of briefs, discarded.EventPhone CallFinal
03/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/16/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - H. W. Rasmussen for appellee; Timothy S. Tarver for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/24/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Timothy S. Tarver for appellants; H.W. Rasmussen for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/24/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/26/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirmed in part and reversed in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/13/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/13/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/14/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal