judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RIVERSIDE RESORT VS. 8TH JUD DIST CT

Case Information: 33510
Short Caption:RIVERSIDE RESORT VS. 8TH JUD DIST CTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385505Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/23/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bell & Young--check no. 12429.
12/23/1998Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 98-00499
12/23/1998Petition/WritFiled Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 98-00501
01/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-00548
02/10/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Respondent Clara Wriedt's Answering Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Appellant's Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 99-00931
07/06/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition. Judgment: " . . . we deny the petition." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-05895
08/03/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-07119
08/03/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.