judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00152-CR
02-89-00152-CR
06/08/1989
Other Drug Possession or Delivery
Lyon, Craig Bruce
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/24/1990Mandate Issued
08/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/02/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
04/24/1990Order Entered
02/16/1990Brief Filed
01/23/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/27/1989Submission
11/27/1989Brief Filed
10/30/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/26/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/26/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/28/1989No Description Available.
08/28/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/25/1989No Description Available.
08/21/1989Letter
07/31/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/31/1989No Description Available.
06/19/1989No Description Available.
06/08/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/24/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
158th District Court
Denton
Honorable Phillip O. Vick
20870B
10 yrs. TDC