judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHAMBERS, ERNEST R. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-0590
Short Caption:CHAMBERS, ERNEST R. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M956-79Filed Date:04/02/1980

Opening Event Date:04/02/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/29/1983
Argued/Submitted:07/11/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CHAMBERS, ERNEST R. UNITED STATES
04/02/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/24/1980FiledRecord Completed
04/29/1983FiledBriefing Completed
07/11/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/12/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition