judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER ALLEN LYNCH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0020)
Case Number:S-07-0020Case Docketed On:01/25/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER ALLEN LYNCH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER ALLEN LYNCH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher Allen LynchDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/25/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/13/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/13/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/27/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/30/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/01/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appealNotice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
05/02/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
05/02/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal