judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00672-CR
05-89-00672-CR
06/07/1989
All Misdemeanors
Yates, Violet Windle
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/10/2020Order enteredDestroy
10/10/1989Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/10/1989Mandate Issued
10/10/1989Motion to Expedite MandateMotion or Writ Granted
10/10/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
10/10/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
10/10/1989Mandate Issued
10/10/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
08/29/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/25/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/30/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/29/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/27/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
06/26/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/22/1989Transcript Filed
06/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
02/27/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable Ralph E Taite
MA88-03892-E
30 days jail, $2,000. fine