judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00522-CV
14-89-00522-CV
06/08/1989
Contract
Texas Gas Exploration Corporation
Broughton Offshore Ltd. II
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/22/1990Case stored
07/26/1990Mandate Issued
07/26/1990Mandate Issued
07/09/1990No description available.
06/07/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
05/25/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
05/10/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/10/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/27/1990Submitted
03/27/1990Submission
03/27/1990Submitted
03/21/1990Reply Brief Filed
03/06/1990Submission
10/26/1989Ext.time file suppl.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/12/1989Ext.time file supple.brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP
10/09/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/09/1989Case ready to be set
10/09/1989Case ready to be set
09/28/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
09/28/1989No description available.
09/15/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
09/15/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
08/24/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
08/18/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
08/10/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/06/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/06/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/27/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/27/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/08/1989Record Filed (Both records FILED)
06/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/03/1989Motion for new trial FILED
02/15/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantKay J. Hazelwood
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantWilliam E. Junell, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Michael P. Graham
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Kathryn S. Page
Trial Court Information
164th District Court
Harris
83-60828