Case Information: 36625 | |||
Short Caption: | LEDESMA (SANTOS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C163031 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/23/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
08/23/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-14830 | |
10/04/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 00-17606 | |
10/13/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The fast track statement shall be filed within 20 days of the filing of the transcripts. Counsel for appellant shall forward to this court within 5 days of this order, a copy of the rough draft transcript request forms that were filed in the district court. | 00-18146 | |
10/20/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 9, 2000 and July 25, 2000. Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin. Filed in district court on: August 17, 2000. | 00-18668 | |
11/22/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: May 9, 2000 and July 25, 2000. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. | 00-20506 | |
12/06/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-21317 | |
12/06/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 00-21318 | |
12/27/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-22540 | |
03/07/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-04118 | |
04/03/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-04347 | |
04/03/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 6, 2001. | 01-04347 |