judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00509-CR
14-89-00509-CR
06/08/1989
All Misdemeanors
Molina, Anthony
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/07/1989Case stored
08/01/1989Mandate Issued
08/01/1989Mandate Issued
07/17/1989No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/30/1989No motion for rehearing FILED
06/15/1989Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/15/1989Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/14/1989Submitted
06/14/1989Submission
06/14/1989Submitted
06/08/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/08/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/08/1989Case ready to be set
06/08/1989Record Filed (Both records FILED)
06/08/1989Case ready to be set
06/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/07/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/07/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantCharles Rice Young
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 6
Harris
Honorable JACK ROBERT MUSSLEWHITE
4289
$750 fine