Case Information: 36635 | |||
Short Caption: | JORDAN VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0000986A | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/24/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
08/24/2000 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. | 00-14941 | |
10/12/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] " . . . we deny the petition." fn2[We note that petitioner failed to pay the filing fee required by NRS. 2.250. We further conclude that petitioner has not demonstrated good cause to waive the filing fee. This constitutes an independent basis for denial of the petition.] SNP00A-WM/ML/NB | 00-18033 | |
12/04/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] SNP00A-WM/ML/NB | 00-21053 | |
12/20/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 00-21230 | |
12/20/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/05/2001 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. We have reviewed appellant's petition and conclude that en banc reconsideration of the panel's decision is not warranted. " . . . we deny the petition." EN BANC | 01-14949 |