judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00519-CV
14-89-00519-CV
06/08/1989
Other Personal Injury
Palkovic, Paula Jo and Palkovic, Wayne
Cox, John K. Dr. and Lifemark Hospitals of Texas, Inc. Et Al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/11/1991Case stored
12/03/1991Mandate Issued
12/03/1991Mandate Issued
11/18/1991Writ of Error DISPOSEDDENIED
08/22/1990Writ of Error FILED
08/07/1990Writ of Error FILED
07/30/1990No description available.GRANTED
07/24/1990No description available.
07/16/1990No description available.
06/14/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
06/11/1990Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/01/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/13/1990Submitted
03/13/1990Submission
03/13/1990Submitted
03/09/1990Reply Brief Filed
02/16/1990Submission
10/05/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/05/1989Case ready to be set
10/05/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/05/1989Motion to reconsider DISPOSED - ANT, APE, APP, STAGRANTED
10/05/1989Case ready to be set
09/18/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/18/1989Motion to reconsider FILED - ANT, APE, APP, STA
09/07/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
08/25/1989Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
08/22/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/22/1989Case ready to be set
08/22/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/28/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/20/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/20/1989Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
07/07/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/07/1989Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE
06/08/1989Transcript FILED
06/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/21/1988Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/11/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeJoseph R. Alexander
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeSamuel A. Houston
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. James Elskes
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeJames R. Boston, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Douglas S. Sandage
Trial Court Information
61st District Court
Harris
Honorable Shearn Smith
86-42645