Case: 02-97-00255-CR
02-97-00255-CR
06/02/1997
Capital Murder
Valle, III, Robert
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/01/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/03/1998 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | Refused | |
03/06/1998 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
02/04/1998 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/08/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/12/1997 | Submitted | | |
11/12/1997 | Submission | | |
11/10/1997 | Letter | | |
11/05/1997 | Other Document Received | | |
11/04/1997 | Other Document Received | | |
10/29/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
10/29/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/15/1997 | Letter | | |
10/02/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/30/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
08/26/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
08/26/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/26/1997 | Submission | | |
08/25/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
07/23/1997 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/27/1997 | Motion Filed | | |
06/02/1997 | Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits | | |
06/02/1997 | Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed | | |
06/02/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/01/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Valle, III, Robert | Criminal - Appellant | Robert Ford |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Tim Curry |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Don Leonard, Criminal District Court No. 3
0597158D
LIFE, IDTDCJ