Case: 03-97-00319-CR
03-97-00319-CR
06/06/1997
Capital Murder
Tremain Tunstall
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/13/2000 | CASE STORED | | |||||
06/01/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
05/25/1999 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
04/28/1999 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | Refused | | ||||
03/31/1999 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
02/22/1999 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | | |||||
11/30/1998 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/05/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
03/31/1998 | Submitted | | |||||
03/31/1998 | Submission | | |||||
03/26/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
03/09/1998 | Submission | | |||||
02/27/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
01/20/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
01/02/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/19/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
11/14/1997 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/03/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
10/03/1997 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
10/03/1997 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||||
09/29/1997 | Order Entered | Ordered | | ||||
09/19/1997 | Affidavit received | | |||||
07/25/1997 | Ext. to file s/facts filed and disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/18/1997 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||||
07/03/1997 | Transcript Filed | | |||||
06/26/1997 | Motion to Substitute Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/23/1997 | Motion to Substitute Filed | | |||||
06/06/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
06/06/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/01/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Hollis C. Lewis Jr. |
Tunstall, Tremain | Appellant | Mr. James H. Kreimeyer |
State Prosecuting Attorney | Interested party | The Honorable Matthew W. Paul |
Court Of Criminal Appeals | Interested party | The Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr. |
Trial Court Information
20th District Court
Milam
Honorable Charles E Lance
19,233
LIFE