judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00144-CR
12-89-00144-CR
06/08/1989
Marijuana Possession
Bryan, Errol, Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/14/1991
01/03/1991Mandate Issued
12/19/1990Record returned.
12/07/1990Higher Court DecisionRefused
11/21/1990Higher Court DecisionRefused
10/22/1990Order received from trial court
09/25/1990ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
09/21/1990
09/10/1990
08/24/1990No Description Available.Reversed
08/24/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/02/1990Submitted
08/02/1990Submission
11/15/1989
11/10/1989Brief Filed
11/10/1989Case ready to be set
10/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/20/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/10/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/15/1989Brief Filed
08/10/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/10/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/02/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/05/1989No Description Available.
06/28/1989
06/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/05/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/26/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/03/1991RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
01/14/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Errol, Jr., BryanAppellantHon. Mark Vela
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasHon Michael Sandlin
Trial Court Information
7th District Court
Smith
7-89-220
30 yrs TDC & $50,000 fine