Case: WR-31,667-02
WR-31,667-02
06/26/1998
1107-HC
HOLCOMB, KENNETH WAYNE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/26/2018 | STATUS (INMATE CORRES) | HC relief denied WITHOUT written order. |
| ||||
07/29/1998 | ACTION TAKEN | HC relief denied WITHOUT written order. | | ||||
07/29/1998 | ACTION TAKEN | HC relief denied WITHOUT written order. | | ||||
07/10/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |||||
07/01/1998 | MISC DOCU RECD | | |||||
06/26/1998 | HC WRIT RECEIVED | | |||||
06/26/1998 | WRIT RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/29/1998 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Holcomb, Kenneth Wayne | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
276th District Court
Marion
11202-B