judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00759-CR
05-89-00759-CR
06/08/1989
Deny Bond
Slayton, Cecil D.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/17/1989Mandate Issued
10/17/1989Mandate Issued
08/17/1989Record RetentionDestroy
08/17/1989Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
08/17/1989Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
08/09/1989Submission
08/09/1989Submitted
08/09/1989Submission
08/09/1989Submitted
07/11/1989Letter Sent by the Court
07/06/1989Brief Filed
06/30/1989Letter Sent by the Court
06/28/1989MattConv
06/23/1989Statement of Facts Filed
06/23/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
06/23/1989Transcript Filed
06/13/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
06/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/23/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/1989Case StoredDestroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
15th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Lloyd Perkins
36,626-B
bond denial