judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00195-CV
08-89-00195-CV
06/08/1989
Contract
James, Mary Ann fka Mary Ann Keirsey
Wilson, William B.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/27/1990Shuck purged
02/27/1990Mandate Issued
02/27/1990Mandate Issued
01/10/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/03/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/28/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
12/28/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/27/1989Motion postponed, to be heard later
12/27/1989Motion postponed, to be heard later
12/14/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
12/13/1989JUDGMENT WITHDRAWN
12/13/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/11/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
12/11/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/04/1989Fee paid
12/04/1989Miscellaneous filing
11/29/1989Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/29/1989Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/09/1989Submitted
11/09/1989Submission
11/09/1989Submitted
11/08/1989Fee paid
11/06/1989Fee paid
11/02/1989Fee paid
11/02/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/02/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
11/01/1989Fee paid
11/01/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
11/01/1989Payment of fee due requested
10/04/1989Submission
08/22/1989Brief Filed
08/22/1989Case ready to be set
08/22/1989Case ready to be set
08/04/1989Brief Filed
08/04/1989Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
07/14/1989Fee paid
07/12/1989Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/12/1989Sup. St. of Facts Filed
07/05/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/05/1989Statement of Facts Filed
06/28/1989Motion to supplement filed
06/21/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/20/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
06/20/1989Payment of fee due requested
06/08/1989Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
06/08/1989Fee paid
06/08/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/08/1989Transcript Filed
06/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. Albert G. Valadez
UnknownAppelleeHon. R. Wayne Pritchard
Trial Court Information
112th District Court
Pecos
7449