judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD DALE BECK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0019)
Case Number:S-07-0019Case Docketed On:01/24/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:RICHARD DALE BECK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD DALE BECK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard Dale Beck Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/24/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of motion to vacate court court appointment - district court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/09/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/12/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/12/2007Event - Phone Call -from public defender indicating judge has signed order rescinding appointment and will send a copy when receivedEventPhone CallFinal
03/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - copy of order vacating appointment filed in district courtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/17/2007Event - Phone Call - from public defender regarding order vacating appointmentEventPhone CallFinal
03/19/2007Event - Phone Call - contacted counsel for appellant regarding vacating of appointment in district court. Requested that a motion be filed pursuant to W.R.A.P. Rule 19.02.EventPhone CallFinal
03/21/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/23/2007Event - Phone Call - at request of court, contacted public defender's office regarding whether or not they had served appellant with the motion to withdraw. Secretary not there, will let us know Monday.EventPhone CallFinal
03/27/2007Event - Phone Call - from public defender's office indicating that a copy of the motion to withdraw was mailed to appellant this dateEventPhone CallFinal
04/11/2007Order - Granting motion to withdraw as counselOrderGrantFinal
05/30/2007Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
06/15/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal