judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REED, WALTER WESLEY UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-0357
Short Caption:REED, WALTER WESLEY UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13638-79Filed Date:03/12/1980

Opening Event Date:03/12/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/13/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/07/1983
Argued/Submitted:09/20/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901REED, WALTER WESLEY UNITED STATES
03/12/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/13/1980FiledRecord Completed
06/07/1983FiledBriefing Completed
09/20/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/29/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition