Summary Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL | |||||
Trial Court Case ID | Originating County | Created | Speedy Trial | Microfilm Ref | |
03841 DACV022943 | SIOUX | 09/02/2010 | |||
Citation Number | Disposition Status | Disposition Date | Reopened Date | ||
09/13/2010 |
Parties Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL Case: 03841 DACV022943 (SIOUX) Citation Number: | ||||
Name | Role | DOB | Status | |
LANDEGENT TRACI BETH | PLAINTIFF | 06/12/1979 | ACTIVE | |
CHADWELL JAMES BRIAN | DEFENDANT | 03/13/1979 | ACTIVE |
Long Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL Case: 03841 DACV022943 (SIOUX) Citation Number: | ||
No Long Title found. |
Filings Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL Case: 03841 DACV022943 (SIOUX) Citation Number: | |||||
Event | Filed By | Filed | Create Date | Last Updated | Action Date |
SERVICE | 09/13/2010 | 09/13/2010 | 09/13/2010 | ||
Comments: RETURN OF SERVICE:JAMES CHADWELL | |||||
(JAMES WAS SERVED ON 09/09/2010. FEES OF $25.86) | |||||
PROTECTIVE ORDER | NEARY JEFFREY A | 09/13/2010 | 09/13/2010 | 09/13/2010 | |
Comments: FINAL DOMESTIC ABUSE PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||||
(THIS ORDER SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT UNTIL SEPT. 13, 2011) | |||||
TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER | SCOTT JAMES DOUGLAS | 09/02/2010 | 09/02/2010 | 09/02/2010 | |
Comments: TEMPROARY PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||||
(HRG IS SET FOR SEPT. 13, 2010 AT 10:30 AM ) | |||||
NOTICE | 09/02/2010 | 09/02/2010 | 09/02/2010 | ||
Comments: NOTICE OF HEARING | |||||
(HRG IS SET FOR SEPT. 13, 2010 AT 10:30 AM ) | |||||
Petition for Relief from Domestic Abuse | 09/02/2010 | 09/02/2010 | 09/02/2010 | ||
Comments: PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM DOMESTIC ABUSE |
Property/Lis Pendens Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL Case: 03841 DACV022943 (SIOUX) Citation Number: | ||||||
No Properties found. |
Charges, Dispositions, Sentences Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL Case: 03841 DACV022943 (SIOUX) Citation Number: | ||||||
No Charges found. |
Judgments/Liens | |||||||
Judgment | |||||||
Filed Date | Filed Time | Seq | Status | Status Date | Created | Updated | |
09/13/2010 | 10:45:00 | 0 | NONE | 09/13/2010 | 09/13/2010 | 09/13/2010 | |
Judgment: | CHADWELL,JAMES B AMT. OF COURT COSTS FOR THIS ACTION | ||||||
Satisfaction | |||||||
Side | Name | Satisfaction Status | Status Date | Satisfaction | Sat. Date | Created | Updated |
FOR | STATE OF IOWA, | 09/13/2010 | 09/13/2010 | ||||
AGAINST | CHADWELL, JAMES BRIAN | NONE | 09/13/2010 | Unsatisfied | 09/13/2010 | 09/13/2010 | 09/13/2010 |
Exhibits Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL Case: 03841 DACV022943 (SIOUX) Citation Number: | ||||||
No Exhibits found. |
Financials Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL Case: 03841 DACV022943 (SIOUX) Citation Number: | ||||||||
Summary | Orig | Paid | Due | |||||
COSTS | 210.86 | 0.00 | 210.86 | |||||
FINE | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 | |||||
SURCHARGE | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 | |||||
RESTITUTION | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 | |||||
OTHER | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 | |||||
| | | ||||||
$210.86 | $0.00 | $210.86 | ||||||
SUPPORT/ALIMONY | N/A | 0.00 | N/A | |||||
Detail | Payor/Payee | Obligor/Obligee | Original Amount | Paid Amount | Date | Receipt | Type | |
FILING AND DOCKETING PETITIONS (INCLUDING DISSO) | JAMES CHADWELL / STATE OF IOWA | JAMES CHADWELL / STATE OF IOWA | 185.00 | 0.00 | ||||
REFUNDABLES DUE TO PREPAID EXPENSES | JAMES CHADWELL / TMENT MINNEHAHA COUNTY SHERIFF DEPAR | JAMES CHADWELL / TMENT MINNEHAHA COUNTY SHERIFF DEPAR | 25.86 | 0.00 |
Bonds Posted | ||||||
No Bonds found. |
Service Returns Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL Case: 03841 DACV022943 (SIOUX) Citation Number: | |||||
No Service Returns found. |
Traffic Details Title: TRACI LANDEGENT VS. JAMES B CHADWELL Case: 03841 DACV022943 (SIOUX) Citation Number: | ||||||
No Traffic Details found. |