judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-81-00257-CR
02-81-00257-CR
09/17/1981
All Misdemeanors
Tyree, Joe Wesley
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/20/1983Mandate Issued
05/04/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/17/1982Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/16/1982Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable R. E. Thornton
0160439
6 mos jail 1 yr Prob, $1,000 fine