judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01167-CR
05-81-01167-CR
11/11/1981
Burglary
Williams, Wilbert Carl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/29/2018Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/21/1985Case Returned from Higher Ct.
04/15/1985Mandate Issued
04/08/1985Mandate IssuedDismissed
03/22/1985Opinion issuedDismissed
04/29/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
04/01/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/25/1983Supplemental Record Filed
02/28/1983MattConv
10/06/1982Submission
03/08/1982Brief Filed
02/08/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/06/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/09/1981Brief Filed
11/11/1981Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
11/11/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1985Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable James B. Zimmermann
f80-9931-MJ
Life, TDC