judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GENEVA MCDANIEL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1381
Short Caption:GENEVA MCDANIEL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD12341-10Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/25/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeneva Mcdaniel Y
Cedric D. MillerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/10/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cedric Miller, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/10/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cedric Miller, Esquire
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (96pgs/Tape) 10/26/10 proc. w/CD
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/13/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo).
12/13/2010RECEIVED statement regarding transcript (mlsrt still pend).
12/27/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
12/27/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
12/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (7pgs/Tape) 10/28/10 proc. w/CD
02/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 9, 2011 (no oppo)
02/22/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 11, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 2, 2011
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 10, 2011 (unopposed)
05/10/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 5/17/11
05/18/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix
06/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motions for extensions of time within which to file the brief, to which no oppositions have been filed, and the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motions are granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
07/05/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
07/05/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/05/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD with attached documents
08/10/2011FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion to supplement the record
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
08/17/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal - pending resolution of motion for ineffective assistance of counsel claim (Appellant)Denied as Moot
08/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (Defendant's exhibit B - uniform residential loan application dated 5/15/07)
09/14/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte that the motion for stay is hereby held in abeyance for 90 days
12/22/2011FiledMotion to file notice of 23-110 motion out of time. (Appellant)Granted
01/30/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's moton to stay appeal as moot and granting appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged status statement
01/30/2012FiledNotice Received - status of 23-110 motion (Appellant)
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/25/2012FiledArgued before Judges Thompson, Beckwith, Nebeker Cedric D. Miller, Esq. for appellant Michelle D. Thomas, Esq. for appellee
09/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Nebeker*, Senior Judge.)
10/18/2012FiledMandate