judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00267-CR
04-81-00267-CR
09/17/1981
Robbery
Guzman, Richard S.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/18/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
08/17/1983Mandate Issued
08/17/1983Mandate Issued
07/13/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/09/1983Motion to Amend Filed
06/03/1983Motion for Stay of Mandate DispMotion or Writ Denied
06/02/1983Motion for Stay of Mandate Filed
06/02/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/31/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/31/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/16/1982Submission
11/16/1982Submission
11/16/1982Submitted
04/05/1982Case ready to be set
04/05/1982Brief Filed
04/05/1982Case ready to be set
03/05/1982Brief Filed
02/05/1982Record Filed
02/04/1982Record Approved
09/17/1981Notice of appeal received
09/17/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
81-CR-1901-A
8 years