judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00266-CR
04-81-00266-CR
09/17/1981
Other Drug Possession
Ramirez, David
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/26/1982Mandate Issued
10/26/1982Mandate Issued
07/07/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/07/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/17/1981Notice of appeal received
09/17/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
81-CR-1102
five years