judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD EUGENE DIXON, JR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1380
Short Caption:RONALD EUGENE DIXON, JR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM586-10Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/15/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/11/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald Eugene Dixon, Jr.Y
Kyle A. McGonigalYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/10/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Kyle McGonigal, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/10/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Kyle McGonigal, Esquire
11/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8/3/10 proc. - 6 pages) (tape) (transfered from appeal no. 10-CM-1083)dfe
11/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (8/3/10 proc. - 162 pages) (tape) (transferred from appeal no. 10-CM-1083)dfe
11/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (8/4/10 proc. - 18 pages) (tape) (transferred from appeal no. 10-CM-1083)dfe
11/15/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/18/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/23/2010RECORD INDEX
11/23/2010RECORD COPIES
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 40 days (unopposed)
01/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 7, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 10 days
02/25/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the extent that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be filed within 15 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
03/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
03/18/2011RECEIVED - aplt brief w/appdx.
03/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
03/24/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
04/22/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/22/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/11/2011FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Reid,Nebeker
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, Retired, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
11/04/2011FiledMandate