judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ATKINS (SHAWN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30374
Short Caption:ATKINS (SHAWN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33216 , 37293 , 58289 , 60204 , 60756 , 60817 , 62409 , 62807 , 74600
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C120438Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/24/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/05/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/07/1997Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. ". . . we dismiss this appeal." fn1[We have considered all documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. 01-03090
07/17/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Reconsideration. (Original only with exhibits. Copy without exhibits returned to Appellant.)
07/30/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Reconsideration (original only).
01/16/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Within 10 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified file-stamped copy of the district court's order denying Appellant's habeas corpus petition filed on January 31, 1997, and a certified file-stamped copy of the notice of the entry of the order filed February 5, 1997.
01/26/1998Other Other. Received Certified Copy of Findings Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in the district court on January 31, 1997.
01/26/1998Other Other. Received Certified Copy of Notice of Entry of Order filed in the district court on February 5, 1997.
04/16/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant Appellant's petition, and we reinstate this appeal from an order of the district court denying Appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Further, we have concluded that our review of the complete record is warranted. Accordingly, within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal. fn1-[Cause appearing, we direct the clerk of this court to file the proper person motion for reconsideration received on July 17, 1997.] fn2 -[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
04/16/1998MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Reconsideration.
05/04/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Supplemental Motion to the Appellant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus on Appeal Herein (Received the original and 1 copy.)
06/10/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Receive Case File C120438.
08/19/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for the Release of Case File C120438. (Received original and two copies - one copy returned).
08/19/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Rehearing (pro per/pro se). (Received original and two copies - one copy returned).
08/24/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 24.
08/24/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, a certified copy of the transcript of the post-conviction evidentiary hearing held on January 17, 1997. In the event that the necessary transcript has not yet been prepared and filed in the district court, we direct the district court, within 10 days from the date of this order, to order the prompt preparation of the transcript of the evidentiary hearing. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall deliver a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court within 15 days. Upon completion of the transcript, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days within which to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. 00-21224
01/25/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 17, 1997. Court Reporter: Anita Springs-Walker. 01-01689
02/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn8[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-03224
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03363
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03363