judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01163-CR
05-81-01163-CR
11/11/1981
Theft
Allen Lee Rogers
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/24/2017Order enteredDestroy
11/30/2016Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
03/01/1985Mandate Issued
03/01/1985Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/27/1985MattConv
01/04/1985Motion to stay disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/31/1984Affidavit Filed
12/28/1984Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/28/1984MattConv
12/28/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/07/1984Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
02/07/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/18/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/03/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/07/1983Submitted
08/05/1983Submission
06/13/1983Brief Filed
06/06/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/02/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/30/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/29/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/04/1983Brief Filed
02/03/1983Supplemental Transcript filed
12/08/1981MattConvAbated
11/11/1981Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
11/11/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/24/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Rogers, Allen LeeCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 195th District Court
F80-14273-IN
4 yrs TDC